This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 13:51:32 (UTC).

Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr. vs Snyir, Inc. dba Two Men and a Truck et al.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Snyir, Inc dba Two Men and a Truck. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5362

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja

Defendants

Snyir, Inc. dba Two Men and a Truck

Proctor, James Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danesh, Kevin

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr., Snyir, Inc. dba Two Men and a Truck, James Lee Proctor Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr. (Plaintiff); Participant: James Lee Proctor (Defendant); Participant: Snyir, Inc. dba Two Men and a Truck (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr., Snyir, Inc. dba Two Men and a Truck, James Lee Proctor Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/15/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lupian Jr., Ignacio Ceja. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Ignacio Lupian Jr. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 500728. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Kevin Danesh, retained for Ignacio Ceja Lupian Jr. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.