This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:47 (UTC).

Humboldt County Fair Association vs Victor Matango

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Humboldt County Fair Association filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Victor Matango. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1841

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Humboldt County Fair Association

Defendant

Matango, Victor

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice- Entire Action as to Humboldt County Fair Association, Victor Matango Entered. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service as to Victor Matango (Personal) on 2/27/2016. Service fees $55.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Humboldt County Fair Association. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice- Entire Action as to Humboldt County Fair Association, Victor Matango Entered. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Victor Matango (Personal) on 2/27/2016. Service fees $55.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $2000.00 Costs $50.00 WAIVED Gov't Deferral, set for 03/28/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Humboldt County Fair Association. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less