This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 07:57:22 (UTC).

Humberto Baltazar Luna vs Yessica Luna Rivera

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Humberto Baltazar Luna filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Yessica Luna Rivera. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0426

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Luna, Humberto Baltazar

Respondent

Rivera, Yessica Luna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 73602. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketHearing re: Default Dissolution held on June 17, 2016. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Default Dissolution held on 06/17/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketHearing regarding: Default Dissolution , set for 06/17/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department F1. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketRequest for Default against Yessica Luna Rivera Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketRequest to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Entered against Yessica Luna Rivera Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. (MC-030 and other documents) Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $435.00, receipt number 31142. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketAssessed $435.00 Civil Costs on Petitioner, Luna, Humberto Baltazar Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Humberto Baltazar Luna filed. Filing fee of $435. due by 2/16/16. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Pro Per, retained for Humberto Baltazar Luna . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketCommunity and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketSeparate Property Declaration filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Action Type: Separate Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Luna, Humberto Baltazar. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less