This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 16:20:33 (UTC).

HSBC Bank Nevada, NA vs. Danilo C Guzman

Case Summary

On 03/18/2010 HSBC Bank Nevada, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Danilo C Guzman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4597

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hsbc Bank Nevada, Na

Defendants

Guzman, Danilo C

Guzman, Rosario V

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

03/22/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

03/22/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

04/30/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

04/30/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

07/12/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/15/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/06/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/06/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

04/12/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

04/12/2011: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2011
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 04/12/2011, transaction number 774602 and receipt number 207327. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Association created between Winn, Brian N and HSBC Bank Nevada, NA. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Complaint associated on 04/12/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 04/12/2011, transaction number 774101 and receipt number 207185. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 11130.10. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 141.47. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, NA on 04/01/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Abstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Association created between Winn, Brian N and HSBC Bank Nevada, NA. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Complaint associated on 03/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Statement of Venue filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, NA on 03/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Original Summons filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, NA on 03/18/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, NA on 03/18/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Complaint filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, NA on 03/18/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC BANK NEVADA NATIONAL ASSN is a litigant