This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 20:29:39 (UTC).

Housing Authority vs. Haggerty

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 Housing Authority filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Haggerty. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9510

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Housing Authority Of The County Of San Joaquin, A Public Corporation

Defendant

Haggerty, Tatiana

 

Court Documents

Notice that you have been sued

08/03/2012: Notice that you have been sued

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2013

location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2013

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2013

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Status of Housing Authority of the County of San Joaquin, a public corporation updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Status of Tatiana Haggerty updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Complaint associated on 05/28/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2013

Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
08/03/2012

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Original Summons filed by Housing Authority of the County of San Joaquin, a public corporation on 08/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Housing Authority of the County of San Joaquin, a public corporation on 08/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2012

Complaint filed by Housing Authority of the County of San Joaquin, a public corporation on 08/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less