This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 14:50:57 (UTC).

Household Finance Corp vs. Estela Mejorado

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 Household Finance Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Estela Mejorado. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2712

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Household Finance Corp

Defendant

Mejorado, Estela

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

02/18/2009: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

02/18/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

02/22/2012: Payment Receipt

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

01/01/1900: Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

Archival Judgement Public Civil

01/01/1900: Archival Judgement Public Civil

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketPayment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 02/22/2012, transaction number 942241 and receipt number 251450. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Other Court Location,Stockton,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 12 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • DocketComplaint associated on 12/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Household Finance Corp on 02/18/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Household Finance Corp on 02/18/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORP. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant