This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 10:38:55 (UTC).

Hoopingarner, et al. vs. Pulte Home Corp.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 Hoopingarner filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corp. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8339

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hoopingarner, et al.

Basehore, Betty

Basehore, David

Becker, Duane

Becker, Mary

Bester, Catherine

Brenner, John

Brenner, Mary

Cacace, Beatrice

Daniels, Marian

Danna, Patricia

Davidson, Caron

Davidson, Dennis

El-Amin, Darlene

El-Amin, Shadeed

Hichey, Robert

Hoopingarner, Debra

John Scott Brenner and Mary F. Brenner, as trustees of The Scott & Mary Brenner

Lasiter, Gordon

Lasiter, Mary

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chodzko, Megan Maxine

Chodzko, Megan

Other Attorneys

Phillips, Kory J

Cox, Chip

Glikman, Avi

Boruszewski, Kelly T.

Stone, Collette F.

Moak, Stacy M.

Krmpotic, Joy Stephanie

Brown, Kathleen Q.

Prager, Mark W

Pezold, Daniel G.

Tsang, Kenneth B

Lockhart, Robert D.

Byrnes, Andrew Barclay

Welch, Stephen B.

Colton, Brian E.

 

Court Documents

MC040 Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Mid Valley Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Case Management Conference Continuance Order filed by Peter H Dekker. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order Setting aside the default of CRDF Procida Landscape on the Cross complaint of Pulte Home Corporation signed on 10/11/17 by Judge Ross entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Fenceworks, Inc. dba Golden State Fence Company Notice of Opting-Out of Deemed Cross-Complaint Pursuant to Pre-Trial Order No.1 filed by Fenceworks, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Cross Complaint

Cross-Defendnat Beutler Crop's Answer to Cross-Complaint -First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Beutler Corp. AKA Villara Corp. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service for Cross-Complaint/Summons and supporting documentation as to D & J Plumbing by Personal Service on 3-17-17 filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service for Cross-Complaint/Summons and supporting documentation as to California Mantel by Personal service on 3-17-17 filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

First Roe Amendment to Cross-Complaint

First Roe Amendment to the Cross-Complaint filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation.(Roe 1-3) Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Milgard Manufacturing. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Barbosa Cabinets. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Notice of Appearance Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Capital City Drywall, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Errata Answer

Errata Answer to Pulte Home corporation's Cross-Complaint filed by Creative Design Interiors. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Errata Answer

Errata Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's cross-Complaint filed by Grover/Gonzalez. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Errata Answer

Errata Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint filed by Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc.. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Derek Sagehorn Submitted on Behalf of Pulte Home Company, LLC a Michigan Limited Liability Company, Successor by Conversion of Pulte Home Corporation (erroneously Sued as Pulte Home Corporation) and Plaintiffs in Preparation for the October 30,2019 Order to Show Cause Hearing Regarding Dismissal After Settlement filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 01/29/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/04/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on January 29, 2020. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Re Dismissal filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 10/30/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 01/29/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on October 30, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Derek Saagehorn Submitted on behalf of Pulte Home Company, LLC a Michigan Limited Liability Company, successor by Conversion of Pulte Home Corportion, a Michigan Corporation (erroneously sued as Pulte Home Corporation) and Plaintiffs in Preparation for the October 30, 2019 Order to Show Cause hearing regarding Dismissal after Settlement filed by Pulte Home Corporation, A Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Megan M. Codzko, Esq. in Advance of order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement filed by Hoopingarner, Debra D, et al. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
477 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketPayment received for 194 - Complaint or other 1st paper, 34 - Complex case fee plaintiff in the amount of 1,435.00 on 09/04/2015, transaction number 1553872 and receipt number 412074. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketAddress for Megan Chodzko selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketCause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 02/01/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Ross, Roger. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hoopingarner, Debra D on 09/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoopingarner, Debra D on 09/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hoopingarner, Debra D on 09/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly T Boruszewski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRMPOTIC JOY STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNES, A BARCLAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILLIPS, KORY L.