Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/31/2018 at 00:18:34 (UTC).

Hong Fu vs. Johnny Balcazar

Case Summary

On 09/19/2012 Hong Fu filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Johnny Balcazar. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1765

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fu, Hong

Defendants

Zapata, Susan M

Balcazar, Johnny

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/21/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/14/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Court Trial

12/03/2012: Notice of Court Trial

Notice to Filing Party

11/01/2012: Notice to Filing Party

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

10/30/2012: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

Proof of Service

10/25/2012: Proof of Service

UD105 Answer

10/19/2012: UD105 Answer

Ex Parte Application

10/03/2012: Ex Parte Application

Notice to Filing Party

09/27/2012: Notice to Filing Party

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

01/16/2013: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order

12/14/2012: Minute Order

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

11/19/2012: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

Notice to Filing Party

10/30/2012: Notice to Filing Party

Proof of Service

10/25/2012: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/25/2012: Proof of Service

Payment Receipt

10/02/2012: Payment Receipt

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

09/19/2012: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Complaint

09/19/2012: Complaint

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Status of Hong Fu updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2012
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 09/19/2012, transaction number 1055052 and receipt number 280404. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Address for Hong Fu selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Fu, Hong on 09/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fu, Hong on 09/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Complaint filed by Fu, Hong on 09/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less