This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 23:24:01 (UTC).

Hilla Anwari vs Mohammad Hanif Sadiq

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Hilla Anwari filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Mohammad Hanif Sadiq. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6079

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anwari, Hilla

Respondent

Sadiq, Mohammad Hanif

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 797893.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of FL-120, FL-311 & FL-105 as to Hilla Anwari served on 12/20/2022 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $7.00, receipt number 797054.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Sadiq, Mohammad Hanif.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Sadiq, Mohammad Hanif.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Mohammad Sadiq in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 797052.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $9.00, receipt number 790189.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Anwari, Hilla.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Hilla Anwari in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 790187.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less