This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 02:08:45 (UTC).

Helen Schepcoff vs MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Helen Schepcoff filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MGSACT Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7837

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schepcoff, Helen

Defendants

MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation

Patricia Wong

A and A Senior Living Management, LLC (Doe 2)

All About Caring, LLC (Doe 3)

Fucanan, Fred (Doe 1)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arias, Mike

Defendant Attorneys

Quan, Heidi C.

Beach, Thomas Edwin

Jackson, Esq., Austin T.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Helen Schepcoff, MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation, Patricia Wong, Fred Fucanan (Doe 1), A and A Senior Living Management, LLC (Doe 2), All About Caring, LLC (Doe 3) Entered.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Schepcoff, Helen.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published.

Non-Opposition

Defendant, MGSACT, Inc.'s Non-opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel The Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgeable Of Defendant MGSACT, Inc. filed by MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation.

Opposition

Defendant Patricia Wong's Joinder to Defendant MGSACT, Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To California Code of Civil Procedure Section 36 filed by Patricia Wong.

Opposition

Defendant MGSACT, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preference; Declaration of Rachel K. Mandelberg filed by MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation.

Motion

Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgeable of Defendant MGSACT Inc.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Schepcoff, Helen.

Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion for Trial Preference Pursuant To California Code of Civil Procedure 36; Declaration In Support Thereof filed by Schepcoff, Helen.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff); MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Patricia Wong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; A and A Senior Living Management, LLC (Doe 2) (Defendant); All About Caring, LLC (Doe 3) (Defendant); Fred Fucanan (Doe 1) (Defendant); Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff); MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Patricia Wong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Schepcoff, Helen.; Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Helen Schepcoff, MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation, Patricia Wong, Fred Fucanan (Doe 1), A and A Senior Living Management, LLC (Doe 2), All About Caring, LLC (Doe 3) Entered.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; A and A Senior Living Management, LLC (Doe 2) (Defendant); All About Caring, LLC (Doe 3) (Defendant); Fred Fucanan (Doe 1) (Defendant); Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff); MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Patricia Wong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 10B; Result: Dropped; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 10B; Result: Rescheduled; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Helen Schepcoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Patricia Wong served on 08/20/2021 by Personal Service. $90.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to MGSACT Inc., a California Corporation served on 08/20/2021 by Personal Service. $90.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schepcoff, Helen.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/17/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Schepcoff, Helen.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Helen Schepcoff in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 672734.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Mike Arias, retained for Helen Schepcoff .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGSACT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackson, Austin T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quan, Heidi Coleen