This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:36:56 (UTC).

Hector Rosales et al. vs Saul Alvizar et al.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 Hector Rosales filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Saul Alvizar. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0539

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosales, Claudia

Rosales, Hector

Defendants

Salcedo, Sophia Maria

Alvizar, Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wood, Chad J.

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons as to All Occupants in care of Saul Alvizar, Sophia Maria Salcedo served on 01/17/2018 by Substituted Service, Posting and Mailing. $35.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Saul Alvizar served on 01/31/2018 by Personal Service. $35.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hectpr. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Hector Rosales, Claudia Rosales against Saul Alvizar, Sophia Maria Salcedo filed and entered . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hector. Number 6 incomplete. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Hearing - Unlawful Detainer Trial

Hearing regarding: Demurrer , set for 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department M2. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Saul Alvizar and Sophia Maria Salcedo served on 03/08/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment After Court entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hector. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hector. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hector. Number 6 incomplete. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Saul Alvizar and Sophia Maria Salcedo served on 03/08/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Sophia Maria Salcedo on 02/23/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Saul Alvizar on 02/23/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Payment received by Willbanks & Wood in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 264711. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Hector Rosales, Claudia Rosales against Saul Alvizar, Sophia Maria Salcedo filed and entered . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Salcedo, Sophia Maria. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Attorney, Chad J. Wood, retained for Hector Rosales . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Attorney, Chad J. Wood, retained for Claudia Rosales . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Payment received by Willbanks and Wood in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 251984. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hectpr. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosales, Claudia; Rosales, Hectpr. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wood, Chad J.