This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:02 (UTC).

HB Property Holdings, LLC vs Dan Lloyd Edwards

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 HB Property Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dan Lloyd Edwards. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1896

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HB Property Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Edwards, Dan Lloyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patena, Jaime Lao

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service Of Summons and Complaints as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Dan Lloyd Edwards Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Dan Lloyd Edwards served on 03/17/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Dan Lloyd Edwards Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dan Lloyd Edwards served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

03/07/2016: Notice to Filing Party

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons as to Dan Lloyd Edwards INCOMPLETE, DOES NOT LIST METHOD OF SERVICE. filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to all occupants filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for HB Property Holdings, LLC against Dan Lloyd Edwards filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Dan Lloyd Edwards served on 03/17/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Dan Lloyd Edwards on 03/10/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for HB Property Holdings, LLC against Dan Lloyd Edwards filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to all occupants filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 39190. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Dan Lloyd Edwards Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Dan Lloyd Edwards served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons as to Dan Lloyd Edwards INCOMPLETE, DOES NOT LIST METHOD OF SERVICE. filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service Of Summons and Complaints as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by S J Rental Housing Services Corp. in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 34496. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HB Property Holdings, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Jaime Lao Patena, retained for HB Property Holdings, LLC . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less