This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/23/2019 at 14:47:42 (UTC).

Hat Revocable Trust

Case Summary

On 09/25/2015 Hat Revocable Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holland, Lesley D. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0692

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holland, Lesley D.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Garza, Maria

Garza, Antonio Felix

Not Classified By Court and Interested Parties

Haugg, Brenda

Hat Revocable Trust

G & H Custom Farming, LLC

Engh, Christopher

Gully, Vincent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Austin, Jane Allison

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Gianelli, Michael Louis

Allen-Garibaldi, Shari L

Interested Party Attorneys

Engh, Christopher

Van Egmond, Colleen F.

 

Court Documents

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

motion to quash

Motion to Quash Deposition filed by Gully, Vincent; G & H Custom Farming, LLC. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Order

10/17/2017: Proposed Order

Account and Report of the Trustee

Account and Report of the Trustee filed by Haugg, Brenda. Action Type: Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust PR 17200; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Declaration of Shari L Allen-Garibaldi in Support of Motion to Continue Trial

Declaration of Shari L Allen-Garibaldi in Support of Motion to Continue Trial filed by Haugg, Brenda. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proof of service

Proof of service filed by Haugg, Brenda. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Haugg, Brenda; Haugg, Brenda. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Maria Garza, Antonio Felix Garza, Hat Revocable Trust, Brenda Haugg, Brenda Haugg, G & H Custom Farming, LLC Granted. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Petition to Compel Account and Recover costs filed by Haugg, Brenda. Action Type: Objection to Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Attorney, Michael Louis Gianelli, retained for Brenda Haugg . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 7733. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Payment received for 201 - First papers other in the amount of 435.00 on 09/25/2015, transaction number 1566689 and receipt number 414154. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - to Compel Account and Recover Costs scheduled for 11/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in 31 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 31. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Garza, Maria; Garza, Antonio Felix on 09/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (case initiation) (Petition to Compel Account and Recover Costs) filed by Garza, Maria; Garza, Antonio Felix on 09/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less