Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 23:45:28 (UTC).

Harpreet Rai vs. Marcela Barragan

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 Harpreet Rai filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Marcela Barragan. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1584

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rai, Harpreet

Defendants

Dugas, Gerald

Barragan, Marcela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Curry, Patrick

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

11/25/2013: Payment Receipt

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/13/2013: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/04/2013: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

05/06/2013: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

UD116 Declaration for Default Judgment by Court

04/08/2013: UD116 Declaration for Default Judgment by Court

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

04/08/2013: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice to Filing Party

11/29/2012: Notice to Filing Party

Proof of Certified Mail

11/15/2012: Proof of Certified Mail

Notice to Filing Party

11/15/2012: Notice to Filing Party

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

04/03/2013: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

12/14/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

11/15/2012: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

10/05/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

10/05/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Payment Receipt

10/01/2012: Payment Receipt

Ex Parte Application for an Order for Posting Unlawful Detainer

09/25/2012: Ex Parte Application for an Order for Posting Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/14/2012: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

UD100 Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

09/14/2012: UD100 Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2014
  • Case note created on 04/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • location changed from Other Court Location,Manteca,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 11/25/2013, transaction number 1259322 and receipt number 333612. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Complaint associated on 11/25/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • location changed from Offsite,Records Management to Other Court Location,Manteca,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 5244.13. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 249.72. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Rai, Harpreet on 11/13/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • location changed from Other Court Location,Manteca,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2012
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/14/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 09/14/2012, transaction number 1052721 and receipt number 279850. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Address for Patrick Curry selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Rai, Harpreet on 09/14/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rai, Harpreet on 09/14/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Complaint filed by Rai, Harpreet on 09/14/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curry, Patrick