Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:09:30 (UTC).

Harminder Deol vs Craig L Moore et al.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 Harminder Deol filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Craig L Moore. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eagle, Kristine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************9728

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eagle, Kristine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deol, Harminder

Defendants

Moore, Estrellita B

Moore, Craig L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore served on 11/29/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Harminder Deol against Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore and all occupants Entered Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons as to all occupants filed by Deol, Harminder. Service date 10/13/16, fees $35.00. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Estrellita B Moore served on 10/13/2016 by Post & Mail. $35.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Craig L Moore served on 10/13/2016 by Post & Mail. $35.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore served on 11/29/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Estrellita B Moore on 11/08/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Craig L Moore on 11/08/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Payment received by Harminder Deol in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 118386. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Harminder Deol against Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Craig L Moore, Estrellita B Moore and all occupants Entered Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to all occupants filed by Deol, Harminder. Service date 10/13/16, fees $35.00. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Payment received by Anthony Rowe in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 109122. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Attorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Harminder Deol . Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Deol, Harminder. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Payment received by Anthony Rowe in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 105094. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew