This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 07:32:35 (UTC).

Harjinder Kaur et al. vs ONL Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Harjinder Kaur filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ONL Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1007

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Singh, Davinder

Kaur, Harjinder

Singh, Hardip

Defendants

Uribe, Oscar

ONL Inc.

Uribe, Janelle Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schultz, Brad A

Defendant Attorney

Reisinger, Robert Lee

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singh, Hardip; Singh, Davinder; Kaur, Harjinder. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Singh, Hardip; Singh, Davinder; Kaur, Harjinder. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 08/30/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 08/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/13/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Case Management Order

Case Management Order continuing Case Management Conference from 6/25/2021 to 7/13/2021 filed re Harjinder Kaur, Hardip Singh, Davinder Singh, ONL Inc., Janelle Jackson Uribe, Oscar Uribe. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Uribe, Oscar; Uribe, Janelle Jackson. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

04/20/2021: UNKNOWN

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Personal Service as to Oscar Uribe filed by Kaur, Harjinder. (duplicate) Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to ONL Inc. served on 01/28/2021 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Janelle Jackson Uribe served on 01/27/2021 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Oscar Uribe served on 01/27/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by ONL Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by ONL Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Uribe, Oscar; Uribe, Janelle Jackson. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Uribe, Oscar; Uribe, Janelle Jackson. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Davinder Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Hardip Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Harjinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Participant: Janelle Jackson Uribe (Defendant); Participant: ONL Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Oscar Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Davinder Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Hardip Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Harjinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Participant: Janelle Jackson Uribe (Defendant); Participant: ONL Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Oscar Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Davinder Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Hardip Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Harjinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Participant: Janelle Jackson Uribe (Defendant); Participant: ONL Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Oscar Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment (est 7 days), set for 02/14/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 01/09/2023 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 08/30/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on August 30, 2021. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Harjinder Kaur in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 660448. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Davinder Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Hardip Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Harjinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Participant: Janelle Jackson Uribe (Defendant); Participant: ONL Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Oscar Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/13/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/25/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Singh, Hardip; Singh, Davinder; Kaur, Harjinder. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singh, Hardip; Singh, Davinder; Kaur, Harjinder. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Harjinder Kaur in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 610313. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Brad A Schultz, retained for Davinder Singh . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Brad A Schultz, retained for Hardip Singh . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Brad A Schultz, retained for Harjinder Kaur . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schultz, Brad A