This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/08/2020 at 04:23:42 (UTC).

CSAA Insurance Exchange vs Hari Bhardwaj et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 CSAA Insurance Exchange filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hari Bhardwaj. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2286

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Bhardwaj, Rose

Bhardwaj, Hari

CSAA Insurance Exchange

Plaintiff and Defendant

CSAA Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bowley, Gordon W.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

09/27/2019: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Petition

Petition and Application for Issuance of Superior Court Case Number (amount over $25,000) filed by Bhardwaj, Rose; Bhardwaj, Hari. Action Type: Unlimited Civil Petition - other (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Defendants' Moving Papers filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Motion to Compel

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Hari Bhardwaj's Answers to Judicial Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration in Support of Motion, and Request for Sanctions filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Motion to Compel

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Rose Bhardwaj's Answers to Judicial Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration in Support of Motion, and Request for Sanctions filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Defendants' Moving Papers filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Compel Rose Bhardwaj's Answers to Judicial Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration in Support of Motion, and Request for Sanctions filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Compel Hari Bhardwaj's Answers to Judicial Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration in Support of Motion, and Request for Sanctions filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received by CSAA Insurance Exchange in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 478940. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received by CSAA Insurance Exchange in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 478940. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogs. , set for 11/08/2019 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Compel , set for 11/08/2019 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Gordon W. Bowley, retained for CSAA Insurance Exchange . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/17/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition and Application for Issuance of Superior Court Case Number (amount over $25,000) filed by Bhardwaj, Rose; Bhardwaj, Hari. Action Type: Unlimited Civil Petition - other (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Hari Bhardwaj in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474277. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.