Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:25:05 (UTC).

Hancock Revocable Living Trust vs Eric Mapp

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 Hancock Revocable Living Trust filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Eric Mapp. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1066

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hancock Revocable Living Trust

Defendant

Mapp, Eric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Welch, John W

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment held on 12/27/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Order for Temporary Stay as to Eric Mapp Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order for Temporary Stay as to Eric Mapp Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

12/09/2016: FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Eric Mapp. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Eric Mapp Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Eric Mapp served on 12/13/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Declaration in support of ex parte application for temporary stay of execution of judgment filed by Mapp, Eric. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Mapp, Eric. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Hancock Revocable Living Trust against Eric Mapp filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Eric Mapp served on 11/02/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Lieu of Testimony filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Eric Mapp served on 12/13/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Hearing re: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment held on December 27, 2016. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment held on 12/27/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Eric Mapp Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT filed by Mapp, Eric. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment , set for 12/27/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Eric Mapp. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Eric Mapp served on 11/02/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Attorney, John W Welch, retained for Hancock Revocable Living Trust . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Payment received by Hancock Revocable Living Trust in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 116212. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welch, John W