Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 19:00:45 (UTC).

Hancock Revocable Living Trust vs April Rochelle Palmer

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 Hancock Revocable Living Trust filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against April Rochelle Palmer. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9060

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hancock Revocable Living Trust

Defendant

Palmer, April Rochelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Welch, John W

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Hancock Revocable Living Trust against April Rochelle Palmer in the amount of $2899.14. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

10/20/2016: Writ Return

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Hancock Revocable Living Trust against April Rochelle Palmer filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. - All Occupants Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to April Rochelle Palmer served on 09/13/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against April Rochelle Palmer Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Hancock Revocable Living Trust against April Rochelle Palmer in the amount of $2899.14. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to April Rochelle Palmer on 09/28/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Hancock Revocable Living Trust against April Rochelle Palmer filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Payment received by Lisa Rotert in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 105319. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. - All Occupants Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against April Rochelle Palmer Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to April Rochelle Palmer served on 09/13/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Attorney, John W Welch, retained for Hancock Revocable Living Trust . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Payment received by Hancock Revocable Living Trust in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 100312. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hancock Revocable Living Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welch, John W