This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

Halo Managers Corp. vs Audrey Barnett

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Halo Managers Corp filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Audrey Barnett. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1808

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Halo Managers Corp.

Defendant

Barnett, Audrey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Welch, John W

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Audrey Barnett Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Audrey Barnett served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Audrey Barnett served on 03/17/2016 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $125.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Halo Managers Corp. against Audrey Barnett filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Audrey Barnett served on 03/17/2016 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $125.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Audrey Barnett on 03/09/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Halo Managers Corp. against Audrey Barnett filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 38823. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Audrey Barnett Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Audrey Barnett served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33739. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Halo Managers Corp.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, John W Welch, retained for Halo Managers Corp. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less