This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 01:51:13 (UTC).

Grady Jackson vs S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Grady Jackson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S S Auto Sales, Inc , a California corporation dba 303 Motors. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2268

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson, Grady

Defendants

Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation

S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Babbitt, Gregory T

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Grady Jackson, S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors, Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation Entered. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors served on 10/01/2019 by Substituted Service. $96.90. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation served on 10/03/2019 by Personal Service. $35.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Affidavit of Venue

Affidavit Venue Pursuant to Civil Code 1780(d) filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Statement of Damages

Statement of Actual and Punitive Damages filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Grady Jackson (Plaintiff); Participant: Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Participant: S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Grady Jackson, S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors, Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation Entered. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to S&S Auto Sales, Inc., a California corporation dba 303 Motors served on 10/01/2019 by Substituted Service. $96.90. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Great American Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation served on 10/03/2019 by Personal Service. $35.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Actual and Punitive Damages filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Venue Pursuant to Civil Code 1780(d) filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Grady. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Grady Jackson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474103. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory T Babbitt, retained for Grady Jackson . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.