This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 19:32:28 (UTC).

Gonzalo Chavez Jr vs Marissa Marie Chavez

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 Gonzalo Chavez Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Marissa Marie Chavez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1090

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chavez, Gonzalo Jr

Respondent

Chavez, Marissa Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lee, Christie S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Gonzalo Chavez Jr, Marissa Marie Chavez Entered. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Chavez, Gonzalo Jr. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Case associated with case: , STA-FL-PAT-2017-0006676 Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Marissa Marie Chavez. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Chavez, Marissa Marie. Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Chavez, Marissa Marie. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Chavez, Marissa Marie. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Chavez, Marissa Marie. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Request for Default against Marissa Marie Chavez Not Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Chavez, Gonzalo Jr. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Marissa Marie Chavez filed. Served on 04/13/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Attorney, Christie S Lee, retained for Gonzalo Chavez Jr . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Chavez, Gonzalo Jr. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Payment received by Christie Lee in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 147388. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Chavez, Gonzalo Jr. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Christie S