This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 21:02:39 (UTC).

Goldman Sachs Bank USA vs Vang Lo

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Goldman Sachs Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vang Lo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0519

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank USA

Defendant

Lo, Vang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gramajo, Andrew J

Defendant Attorney

Galletta, Jessica

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Vang Lo served on 01/29/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.

Answer

Answer filed by Lo, Vang.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/29/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

MC040 Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 06/26/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

CM200 Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

Stipulation

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment Pending Performance Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2024

HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff); Vang Lo (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff); Vang Lo (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 06/26/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCase status updated to Conditional Settlement.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment Pending Performance Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/29/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
04/04/2023

DocketPayment received by Vang Lo in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 823806.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Vang Lo served on 01/29/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Goldman Sachs Bank USA in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 805772.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Andrew J Gramajo, retained for Goldman Sachs Bank USA .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less