This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 01:02:32 (UTC).

Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership vs City of Stockton, a public entity

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership filed an Other lawsuit against City of Stockton, a public entity. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1134

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Notice to Filing Party

02/14/2022: Notice to Filing Party

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer to the Complaint by Defendant City of Stockton

Answer to the Complaint by Defendant City of Stockton filed by City of Stockton, a public entity.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership, City of Stockton, a public entity Entered. With prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; City of Stockton, a public entity (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership, City of Stockton, a public entity Entered. With prejudice; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to the Complaint by Defendant City of Stockton filed by City of Stockton, a public entity.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAttorney, John R Mulroy, retained for City of Stockton, a public entity .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/12/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LP, Golden Opportunity Investments in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 716835.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney, H.G. Long, Esq., retained for Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, a limited partnership .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less