Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:39:04 (UTC).

Gloria Perkins vs La Cantina Sports Bar & Grill et al.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2016 Gloria Perkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against La Cantina Sports Bar Grill. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3126

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perkins, Gloria

Defendants

La Cantina Sports Bar & Grill

Jones, Geneva

Bachman, Ann Marie

Geneva Jones as individual and dba The Blue Moon Lounge & Sports Bar,

Ann Marie Bachman as individual and dba The Blue Moon Lounge & Sports Bar,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Judgment held on 06/04/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request to Enter Default held on 01/04/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

W. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 10/03/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

12/29/2016: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Statement of Damages filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to La Cantina Sports Bar & Grill. Also dismissing Geneva Jones as an individual ONLY Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/03/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ann Marie Bachman as individual and dba The Blue Moon Lounge & Sports Bar Entered Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ann Marie Bachman as individual and bda The Blue Moon Lounge & Sports Bar served on 01/03/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Judgment held on June 4, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Judgment held on 06/04/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/06/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Statement of Damages filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Statement of Damages filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request to Enter Default held on April 4, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request to Enter Default held on 04/04/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 06/04/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ann Marie Bachman as individual and bda The Blue Moon Lounge & Sports Bar served on 01/03/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/03/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Attorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Gloria Perkins . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Payment received by Gloria Perkins in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 129943. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Perkins, Gloria. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrillo, Rafael