This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 10:05:56 (UTC).

Glen D Munoz vs Evangelina Munoz

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Glen D Munoz filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Evangelina Munoz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6660

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Munoz, Glen D

Respondent

Munoz, Evangelina

Not Classified By Court

Wolf - 2019, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Respondent Attorney

Smith, Temica N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Financial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Evangelina Munoz (Respondent); Glen D Munoz (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Evangelina Munoz (Respondent); Glen D Munoz (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of FL-320 and Supporting Documents as to Evangelina Munoz served on 05/25/2023 by Mailing. .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketResponsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee) filed by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Evangelina Munoz (Respondent); Glen D Munoz (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Glen D Munoz, Evangelina Munoz Entered.; Judge: Craddick, Judith S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO spousal support, atty fees, husband to provide mortgage statements/house sale *No POS*, set for 06/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketGolden Rod; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketRFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted submitted by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Glen Munoz in the amount of $85.00. Receipt number 799733.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Glen Munoz in the amount of $85.00. Receipt number 799733.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Lisa Thiessen, retained for Glen D Munoz .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Lisa Thiessen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 799210.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Munoz, Glen D.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less