This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 07:37:50 (UTC).

Girish Kumar vs Jingli Yang

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Girish Kumar filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jingli Yang. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3518

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kumar, Girish

Respondent

Yang, Jingli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Respondent Attorney

Kayyali, Rami

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketGavron Admontioin to Respondent Filed by Girish Kumar Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jingli Yang filed. Served on 08/25/2021. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Rami Kayyali, retained for Jingli Yang . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Yang, Jingli. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jingli Yang in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 674757. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Girish Kumar . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Kumar, Girish. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Dianne Butler in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 670796. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAYYALI RAMI MUSA