This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:49:52 (UTC).

Gimbal Capital, INC, vs Paul Robbins

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Gimbal Capital, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Paul Robbins. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1943

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gimbal Capital, INC,

Defendant

Robbins, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenosian, John P

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Paul Robbins served on 01/31/2017 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Gimbal Capital, INC,, Paul Robbins Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM180 Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Gimbal Capital, INC,, Paul Robbins Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Paul Robbins served on 01/31/2017 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, John P Kenosian, retained for Gimbal Capital, INC, . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34882. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gimbal Capital, INC,. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less