This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 16:35:38 (UTC).

Gill Medical Center, LLC vs Dignity Health

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 Gill Medical Center, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0368

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gill Medical Center, LLC

Defendant

Dignity Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Conger, John R

 

Court Documents

cm-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gill Medical Center, LLC.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gill Medical Center, LLC.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dignity Health served on 11/14/2022 by Personal Service. $65.00.

Peremptory Challenge

Declaration of prejudice pursuant to 170.6 CCP as to Judge Erin Guy Castillo filed by plaintiff.

Answer

Defendant Dignity Health's Answer to Complaint filed by Dignity Health.

Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Admitting William Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Garrick Vanderfin in Support of Motion for an Order Admitting William Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of William R. Meyer in Support of Motion for an Order Admitting William R. Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service via US Mail and Electronic Mail filed by Dignity Health.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Dignity Health (Defendant); Gill Medical Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service via US Mail and Electronic Mail filed by Dignity Health.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of William R. Meyer in Support of Motion for an Order Admitting William R. Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Garrick Vanderfin in Support of Motion for an Order Admitting William Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion for an Order Admitting William Meyer Pro Hac Vice filed by Dignity Health.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Dignity Health in the amount of $500.00. Receipt number 802752.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, set for 02/08/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Dignity Health's Answer to Complaint filed by Dignity Health.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Dignity Health in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 796983.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of prejudice pursuant to 170.6 CCP as to Judge Erin Guy Castillo filed by plaintiff.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dignity Health served on 11/14/2022 by Personal Service. $65.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gill Medical Center, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gill Medical Center, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Gill Medical Center in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 787136.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAttorney, John R Conger, retained for Gill Medical Center, LLC .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conger, John R