This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/03/2020 at 01:18:04 (UTC).

Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust vs Ralph Saldana Jr

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Gianfranco Rosemary Corti Trust filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ralph Saldana Jr. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7112

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust

Defendant

Saldana Jr, Ralph

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hardwick, Robert O

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allow Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ralph Saldana Jr served on 06/12/2019 by Post & Mail. $70.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 06/12/2019. $25.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust against Ralph Saldana Jr, All Other Occupants filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Ralph Saldana Jr served on 07/16/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Ralph Saldana Jr served on 07/16/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Ralph Saldana Jr on 07/02/2019 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketPayment received by valley eviction services in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 441215. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust against Ralph Saldana Jr, All Other Occupants filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 06/12/2019. $25.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ralph Saldana Jr served on 06/12/2019 by Post & Mail. $70.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Default against Ralph Saldana Jr, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Valley Evictions in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 431928. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Valley Eviction Services in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 429576. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Robert O Hardwick, retained for Gianfranco & Rosemary Corti Trust . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hardwick, Robert O