This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 14:38:25 (UTC).

German Aguilar Morales vs Lucia Lopez Bravo

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 German Aguilar Morales filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lucia Lopez Bravo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1965

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Morales, German Aguilar

Respondent

Bravo, Lucia Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $15.00, receipt number 120393. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketRequest for Default against Lucia Lopez Bravo Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Lucia Lopez Bravo filed. Served on 05/03/2016. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $435.00, receipt number 56931. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to German Aguilar Morales filed. Payment or Re-Filing with an Income and Expense Declaration due by 05/05/2016 Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Morales, German Aguilar. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Pro Per, retained for German Aguilar Morales . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less