This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:02:13 (UTC).

Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership vs C.C. Myers, Inc. a California corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C C Myers, Inc a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6642

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership

Defendants

Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc., a California corporation

C.C. Myers, Inc. a California corporation

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation

State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wong, Jidi

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership, C.C. Myers, Inc. a California corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation, State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency, Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc., a California corporation Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer

Defendant State Of California, Department Of Transportation's Answer To An Unverified Complaint filed by State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM180 Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Participant as to C.C. Myers, Inc filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Participant; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc., a California corporation served on 07/19/2017 by Substituted Service. $85.55. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency served on 07/17/2017 by Personal Service. $79.25. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of service and Affidavit of Process Server filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership, C.C. Myers, Inc. a California corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation, State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency, Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc., a California corporation Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant State Of California, Department Of Transportation's Answer To An Unverified Complaint filed by State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Attorney, Jidi Wong, retained for State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Participant as to C.C. Myers, Inc filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Participant; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc., a California corporation served on 07/19/2017 by Substituted Service. $85.55. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California Department of Transportation, a California public agency served on 07/17/2017 by Personal Service. $79.25. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service and Affidavit of Process Server filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/22/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gerdau Reinforcing Steel, a Delaware General Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Payment received by a Gerdau Reinforcing Steel in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 184147. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.C. MYERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY CITIES PAVING AND GRADING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, JIDI