This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 05:39:46 (UTC).

Gary Mattes vs. George Perry and Sons, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 12/04/2013 Gary Mattes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against George Perry and Sons, Inc ,. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2146

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication

Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by George Perry And Sons, Inc.,. Action Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Motion in Limine No. 6

Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by George Perry And Sons, Inc.,. Action Type: Motion in Limine; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 5

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Include Evidence Concerning Settlements with Dismissed Cross-Defendants for Lack of Bias filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by George Perry and Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proposed Jury of Instructions

Proposed Jury of Instructions filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: List of Jury of Instructions; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Plaintiffs Motion in Limine # 8

Plaintiffs Motion in Limine # 8 to limit testimony of defendants expert anne fairbbrother filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: Motion in Limine; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Defendant George Perry & Sons Inc.'s Opposition to plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8

Defendant George Perry & Sons Inc.'s Opposition to plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8 To Limit Testimony of Defendants' Expert Anne Fairbrother filed by George Perry and Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Plaintiffs Motion in Limine #11

Plaintiffs Motion in Limine #11 to preclude defendant's experts from offering new opinions at trial filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: Motion in Limine; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

348 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Pending. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Filing as to Gary Mattes, George Perry And Sons, Inc.,, Paul Gomes Entered. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Mattes, Gary. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by George Perry and Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 04/29/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Jury Trial held on 02/26/2019 09:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
569 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketGomes, Paul added as a Defendant effective 12/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint updated 12/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 05/05/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 33 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Lofthus, Linda. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mattes, Gary on 12/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mattes, Gary on 12/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mattes, Gary on 12/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less