This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:38:11 (UTC).

Gary Critelli vs Julie Critelli

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 Gary Critelli filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Julie Critelli. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0485

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Critelli, Gary

Defendant

Critelli, Julie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osgood, Warren

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Critelli, Gary. Service date 11/10/15, fees $25.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Julie Critelli served on 11/10/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 52.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Request for Entry of Default (Clerk or Court Judgment ONLY)

Request for Default against Julie Critelli Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default, Judgment to include all occupants - Civil filed by Critelli, Gary. Entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gary Critelli against Julie Critelli filed and entered. Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Julie Critelli returned Satisfied as to possession only. Sheriff fees of $145.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Julie Critelli returned Satisfied as to possession only. Sheriff fees of $145.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Julie Critelli on 12/01/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 11010. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gary Critelli against Julie Critelli filed and entered. Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default, Judgment to include all occupants - Civil filed by Critelli, Gary. Entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Julie Critelli on 12/01/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketNotice that you have been sued sent to Julie Critelli returned by USPS. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Julie Critelli Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to all occupants filed by Critelli, Gary. Service date 11/10/15, fees $25.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Julie Critelli served on 11/10/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 52.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 6274. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Critelli, Gary. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketAttorney, Warren Osgood, retained for Gary Critelli . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Osgood, Warren