This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:00:28 (UTC).

Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership vs Felisha Gibson-Brown

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Felisha Gibson-Brown. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0070

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership

Defendant

Gibson-Brown, Felisha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Felisha Gibson-Brown served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 55.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Service date 11/01/15, fees $55.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership against Felisha Gibson-Brown filed and entered . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Felisha Gibson-Brown returned Satisfied as to possession only. Sheriff fees of $145.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership against Felisha Gibson-Brown in the amount of $3683.20. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership against Felisha Gibson-Brown in the amount of $3683.20. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Felisha Gibson-Brown returned Satisfied as to possession only. Sheriff fees of $145.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Felisha Gibson-Brown on 11/16/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 7486. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership against Felisha Gibson-Brown filed and entered . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to all occupants filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Service date 11/01/15, fees $55.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Default against Felisha Gibson-Brown Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Felisha Gibson-Brown served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 55.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 3055. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Gann Properties LP, A Limited Partnership . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew