This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:26:54 (UTC).

Gabriela Ornelas Resendiz vs David Illescas Casas

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Gabriela Ornelas Resendiz filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against David Illescas Casas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0835

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas

Respondent

Casas, David Illescas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Request for Default against David Illescas Casas Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to David Illescas Casas filed. Served on 09/14/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Order for Publication of Summons filed by Gabriela Ornelas Resendiz. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Application for Order for Publication or Posting filed by Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas. Action Type: Application for Order for Publication or Posting; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Gabriela Ornelas Resendiz filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Gabriela Ornelas Resendiz . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Resendiz, Gabriela Ornelas. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less