This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 19:46:27 (UTC).

Gabriel Ayala vs. Belete Nigatu Bogale

Case Summary

On 02/25/2009 Gabriel Ayala filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Belete Nigatu Bogale. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3219

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayala, Gabriel

Claimant

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Defendants

S&B Logistics Inc., A Ca Corp.

Bogale, Belete Nigatu

Contreras, C

Lyria, Lydia

All Airport City Cab

Singh, Ravinder

Usa Shuttle Service, Inc., A Ca Corp.

Asb Transport Inc., A Ca Corp.

Lira, Alfredo

Cross Defendants

United Insurance Agencies, Inc., A California Corporation

Carr, Douglas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DeKruif, Michael Kerry

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

11/18/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

08/18/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

05/18/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

04/15/2011: Notice of Case Reassignment

Minute Order

12/13/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

05/21/2010: Notice of Case Reassignment

Notice of Case Reassignment

03/08/2010: Notice of Case Reassignment

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail

09/02/2009: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail

Minute Order

07/27/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/18/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

10/06/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

08/18/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

12/06/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

08/04/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

05/21/2010: Notice of Case Reassignment

Minute Order

03/25/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

02/26/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

05/14/2009: Payment Receipt

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Status of State Compensation Insurance Fund updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Status of Gabriel Ayala updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Status of USA Shuttle Service, Inc., a CA Corp. updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Status of Ravinder Singh updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
676 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2009
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Automatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 07/27/2009 at 08:45:00 AM in 32 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Thomasson, Lauren. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ayala, Gabriel on 02/25/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Complaint filed by Ayala, Gabriel on 02/25/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.