This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 19:24:44 (UTC).

Froila Fernandez et al. vs Francisco Ramos

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Froila Fernandez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Francisco Ramos. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rasmussen, Michael J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1216

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rasmussen, Michael J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fernandez, Allan

Fernandez, Froila

Defendant

Ramos, Francisco

 

Court Documents

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Froila Fernandez.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Allan Fernandez.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less filed by Fernandez, Allan; Fernandez, Froila.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Francisco Ramos served on 12/22/2022 by Personal Service. $75.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Judge: Michael J. Rasmussen; Participants; Allan Fernandez (Plaintiff); Francisco Ramos (Defendant); Froila Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Francisco Ramos served on 12/22/2022 by Personal Service. $75.00.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Froila Fernandez.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Allan Fernandez.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/15/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Fernandez, Froila.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Fernandez, Allan.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less filed by Fernandez, Allan; Fernandez, Froila.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less