This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:24 (UTC).

Frederico Dominguez et al. vs Raymond Frank Acosta Jr.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Frederico Dominguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Raymond Frank Acosta Jr. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1900

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

Dominguez, Enrique

Dominguez, Rosa

Dominguez, Frederico

Dominguez, Jazmin

Defendant

Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.

Guardian Ad Litem

Anaya, Mario

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Minor and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Drake, Benjamin

Defendant Attorney

Williams III, Henry

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/23/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer

ANSWER to Unverified Complaint filed by Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice to Filing Party

04/28/2016: Notice to Filing Party

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Jazmin; Dominguez, Enrique. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor - Mario Anaya appointed Guardian for Enrique Dominguez filed by Enrique Dominguez. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Jazmin; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Frederico. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Jazmin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice to Filing Party

11/01/2016: Notice to Filing Party

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Frederico Dominguez, Rosa Dominguez, Raymond Frank Acosta Jr., Enrique Dominguez, Jazmin Dominguez, Mario Anaya Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/22/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice to Filing Party

06/09/2016: Notice to Filing Party

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dominguez, Jazmin; Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Enrique. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dominguez, Jazmin; Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Frederico. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 04/27/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor - Mario Anaya appointed Guardian for Jazmin Dominguez filed by Jazmin Dominguez. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Frederico Dominguez, Rosa Dominguez, Raymond Frank Acosta Jr., Enrique Dominguez, Jazmin Dominguez, Mario Anaya Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Jazmin; Dominguez, Rosa. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 04/27/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Hearing Result: TSCF Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Frederico. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Acosta, Raymond Frank Jr.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • W. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/23/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Jazmin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by Run With It in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34544. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dominguez, Frederico; Dominguez, Enrique; Dominguez, Rosa; Dominguez, Jazmin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Benjamin Drake, retained for Enrique Dominguez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Benjamin Drake, retained for Rosa Dominguez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Benjamin Drake, retained for Jazmin Dominguez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Benjamin Drake, retained for Frederico Dominguez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less