This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 04:54:21 (UTC).

Freddie Mercado vs Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 Freddie Mercado filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc , a Delaware corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0139

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercado, Freddie

Defendant

Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westrup, R. Duane

Defendant Attorney

Husar, Linda S.

 

Court Documents

Order

Order of Dismissal - Case as to Freddie Mercado, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to take January 11, 2017 Status Conference off Calendar in Favor of Scheduled 02/27/2017 status conference entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to Continue Hearing entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Stipulation & Order to Continue Hearing entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to Continue Status Conference entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to stay the Case to allow Parties to Pursue Alternative Dispute Resolution entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation served on 01/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $98.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercado, Freddie. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mercado, Freddie. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Payment received by Freddie Mercado in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 142832. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal - Case as to Freddie Mercado, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Payment received by Freddie Mercado in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 132260. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order to take January 11, 2017 Status Conference off Calendar in Favor of Scheduled 02/27/2017 status conference entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order to Continue Hearing entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/11/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Payment received by Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 121458. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2016
  • Attorney, Linda S. Husar, retained for Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation served on 01/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $98.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/28/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercado, Freddie. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 20644. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mercado, Freddie. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Attorney, R. Duane Westrup, retained for Freddie Mercado . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less