This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/07/2020 at 04:11:42 (UTC).

Frank Montalvo vs Sherry Espinosa

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Frank Montalvo filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sherry Espinosa. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7311

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Montalvo, Frank

Defendant

Espinosa, Sherry

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Frank Montalvo. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sherry Espinosa served on 06/11/2019 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Frank Montalvo against Sherry Espinosa filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Sherry Espinosa served on 07/30/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

06/10/2019: FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

08/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession as to Sherry Espinosa served on 07/30/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Sherry Espinosa on 07/10/2019 to San Joaquin County. Fees Waived Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2019

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Frank Montalvo against Sherry Espinosa filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2019

DocketRequest for Default against Sherry Espinosa Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Sherry Espinosa served on 06/11/2019 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Frank Montalvo. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Montalvo, Frank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less