This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 13:04:19 (UTC).

Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company vs Freight Broker Inc., a California corporation dba Bullseye Transport et al.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Freight Broker Inc , a California corporation dba Bullseye Transport. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0490

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Defendants

Chai, Yuwei

Freight Broker Inc., a California corporation dba Bullseye Transport

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iezza, Nick I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Yuwei Chai served on 01/27/2023 by Personal Service. $167.10.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Freight Broker Inc., a California corporation dba Bullseye Transport (Defendant); Yuwei Chai (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Yuwei Chai served on 01/27/2023 by Personal Service. $167.10.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/24/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 805499.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Nick I. Iezza, retained for Fora Financial Asset Securization 2021 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less