This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:48:00 (UTC).

Financial Center Credit Union vs Rosa Flores

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Financial Center Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rosa Flores. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1920

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Center Credit Union

Defendant

Flores, Rosa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramsey, Bruce E

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Financial Center Credit Union against Rosa Flores in the amount of $21318.53. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Rosa Flores served on 03/12/2016 by Substituted Service. $127.50. No physical description given of 'Melissa' no last name Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Bruce E. Ramsey in Support of prejudgment Accrued Interest

Declaration of Bruce E. Ramsey in Support of prejudgment Accrued Interest filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Rosa Flores Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Steve Leiga for entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration of Steve Leiga for entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Financial Center Credit Union against Rosa Flores in the amount of $21318.53. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Bruce E. Ramsey in Support of prejudgment Accrued Interest filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Steve Leiga for entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Rosa Flores Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Rosa Flores served on 03/12/2016 by Substituted Service. $127.50. No physical description given of 'Melissa' no last name Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/25/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 34683. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Financial Center Credit Union. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Bruce E Ramsey, retained for Financial Center Credit Union . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less