This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 18:17:19 (UTC).

FIA Card Services NA vs. Eleanor T Ramsey

Case Summary

On 11/29/2010 FIA Card Services NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eleanor T Ramsey. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9757

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fia Card Services Na

Defendant

Ramsey, Eleanor T

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

09/15/2011: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

02/08/2011: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/30/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/30/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

11/30/2010: Payment Receipt

Declaration Re: Venue

11/29/2010: Declaration Re: Venue

SUM100 Summons - Civil

11/29/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

PLD-C-001 Complaint

11/29/2010: PLD-C-001 Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Status of FIA Card Services NA updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Status of Eleanor Ramsey updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Complaint associated on 09/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Complaint dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal as to FIA Card Services NA only. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Original Summons filed by FIA Card Services NA on 11/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FIA Card Services NA on 11/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Complaint filed by FIA Card Services NA on 11/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.