This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 22:45:08 (UTC).

FIA Card Services, N.A. vs. Cheryl Evans

Case Summary

On 05/04/2010 FIA Card Services, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cheryl Evans. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7458

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fia Card Services, N.A.

Defendant

Evans, Cheryl

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

05/04/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

05/04/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

05/04/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

07/07/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

07/08/2010: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Minute Order

12/07/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

12/13/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

12/13/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

01/18/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

01/20/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

02/08/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

02/08/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

02/10/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

03/01/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/01/2011: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • $50.00 owed by Evans, Cheryl due on 02/18/2011 referred to MSB1 Government Services 6 mo - 2 yrs on 10/06/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Association created between Henriques, Janalie and FIA Card Services, N.A.. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Complaint (Dismissal not entered, dismissal entered in court on 03 01 11) associated on 03/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (Dismissal not entered, dismissal entered in court on 03 01 11) filed by FIA Card Services, N.A. on 02/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Draft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Matter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Draft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 05/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Payment received for 135 - Complaint or other 1st paper >$10K<=$25K in the amount of 330.00 on 05/04/2010, transaction number 525770 and receipt number 125833. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Address for Janalie Henriques selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Original Summons filed by FIA Card Services, N.A. on 05/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FIA Card Services, N.A. on 05/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Complaint filed by FIA Card Services, N.A. on 05/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant