This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:16:57 (UTC).

Eva Marie Rainer vs Matthew Adam Rainer

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Eva Marie Rainer filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Matthew Adam Rainer. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0374

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rainer, Eva Marie

Respondent

Rainer, Matthew Adam

Not Classified By Court

Wolf - 2019, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jensen, Leslie Frederick II

Respondent Attorney

Dorn, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4A; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Settlement Conference; Court Room: 4A; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent); Participant: Sarah Wolf - 2019 (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Mediation; Court Room: 4B; Judge: Seth R. Hoyt Jr.; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 4B; Result: Held; Judge: Seth R. Hoyt Jr.; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Result: Held; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Transferred to another department; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Eva Marie Rainer (Petitioner); Participant: Matthew Adam Rainer (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial , set for 11/05/2021 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mediation , set for 11/05/2021 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Seth R. Hoyt Jr. in Department 4B. Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 10/04/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Rainer, Matthew Adam. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Matthew Rainer in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 628115. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Rainer, Eva Marie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Leslie Frederick Jensen II, retained for Eva Marie Rainer . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Eva Rainer in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 618288. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Rainer, Eva Marie . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Rainer, Eva Marie. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dorn, Jessica