This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 03:13:54 (UTC).

Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market vs Jose G Prado dba Prado & Sons Trucking

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Eugenia Valdez dba J L Market against Jose G Prado dba Prado Sons Trucking in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2313

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market

Defendant

Jose G Prado dba Prado & Sons Trucking

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market, Jose G Prado dba Prado & Sons Trucking Entered. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial $4,100.00 Principal, $50.00 Costs, set for 12/12/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 3B. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by Eugenia Valdez dba J&L Market in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 474464. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.