Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 22:19:34 (UTC).

Eugenia E Giguere vs. Pacific Mountain Partnership

Case Summary

On 08/28/2014 Eugenia E Giguere filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pacific Mountain Partnership. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8743

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martinez, Teresita

Szeliga, Petere

Majid, Mohammed

Lund, David

Majid, Yasir

Prosser, Thomas

Vita, Ashley

Mann, Kanwaljit

Defendant

Pacific Mountain Partnership

Cross Defendants

Kenyon Plastering, Inc.

Blue Ribbon Stairs

Larry Methvin Installation, Inc.

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Roes 1-500

Custom Marble & Onyx

Sacramento Building Products

Spirit Heating And Air, Inc.

Jdm Construction Co., Inc.

Budget Drywall, Co.

Special Master

Najarian, Jube J.

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Fama, Thomas D.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Walsh, Paul Bradley

Booth, Eileen T

Other Attorneys

Yee, Darryl Michael

Tierney Jr, Justin N

Whitaker, Michael Thomas

Mackey, Scott Michael

Meyer, Raymond Jr.

Eisenberg, Melissa Wood

Lifter, Jill J.

Levy, David Mark

Bromgard, Todd D

Ferla, Steven

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Pacific Mountain Partnership. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Cross Defendants Notice of Opt in to Deemed Cross Complaint

09/01/2015: Cross Defendants Notice of Opt in to Deemed Cross Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

09/01/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

09/01/2015: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Order Granting Defendants Application for Service via Secretary of State

09/01/2015: Order Granting Defendants Application for Service via Secretary of State

Proof of Service by Mail

09/01/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

Payment Receipt

05/05/2015: Payment Receipt

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Moes 1 - 100, Inclusive, Town & Country Roofing Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Notice of Settlement and Application of Good Faith Settlement filed by North Valley Construction. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Application for Good Faith Settlement

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Champlin Painting, Inc.. Action Type: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

09/01/2015: CM110 Case Management Statement

CM110 Case Management Statement

09/01/2015: CM110 Case Management Statement

Cross Defendants Answer to Cross Complaint

09/01/2015: Cross Defendants Answer to Cross Complaint

Declaration of Due Diligence

09/01/2015: Declaration of Due Diligence

CM110 Case Management Statement

09/01/2015: CM110 Case Management Statement

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on December 1, 2016. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 12/01/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 10/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 12/01/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on October 25, 2016. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Moes 1 Through 100, Inclusive, J. Redfren, Inc. dba Golden State Landscaping Entered. Cross complaint filed 1/27/15 Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to Cross Complaint filed by J. Redfren, Inc. dba Golden State Landscaping. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Complaint of Eugenia E Giguere, Pacific Mountain Partnership, Gerard N Gladu, Channy Neang, Ramanpreet Bhinder, Monika Szeliga, Petere Szeliga, Nathaniel Burch, Chandra Meas, Roneesh Raj, Aaron Dye, Lorenzo Smiley, Manjit Sidhu, Kanwaljit Mann, Ashley Vita, Rupert Idemne, Ana Landa Entered. Complaint of Eugenia E. Giguere filed 9/18/14 Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
822 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2014
  • Address for Michael Whitaker selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Cause of Action number 5 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Cause of Action number 4 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 01/26/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Ross, Roger. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Giguere, Eugenia E on 08/28/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Complaint filed by Giguere, Eugenia E on 08/28/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SACRAMENTO BUILDING PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Spirit Heating & Air, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where KENYON PLASTERING, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATION INC. is a litigant