This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 15:50:53 (UTC).

Esther Woodward et al. vs Carol Nakashima et al.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2016 Esther Woodward filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Carol Nakashima. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7012

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

Woodward, Esther

Lovell, Autumn

Defendants

Sutter Gould Medical Foundation

Nakashima, M.D., Carol

The Gould Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Baghdadi, Khaldoun A.

Defendant Attorney

Zimmerman, Robert H.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Plaintiff Ester Woodward in Support of Motion for Trial Setting Preference filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nakashima, M.D., Carol; The Gould Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name) filed by Lovell, Autumn; Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sutter Gould Medical Foundation served on 08/04/2016 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Carol Nakashima, M.D. served on 08/04/2016 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Autumn Lovell, Esther Woodward. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Nakashima, M.D., Carol. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice - Entire Action as to Esther Woodward, Carol Nakashima, M.D., Esther Woodward, The Gould Medical Group, Inc. Entered. Each Party to Bear Their Own Costs. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Trial Setting Preference filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Christian R. Jagusch in Support of Motion for Trial Setting Preference filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion for Trial Setting Preference filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing - Civil Jury Trial

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Jury Trial Assignment, set for 11/13/2017 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Autumn Lovell. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer

Answer to Complaint by Defendant Gould Medical Group, Inc, Sued Herein as Doe One (amount over $25,000) filed by The Gould Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Nakashima, M.D., Carol. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice - Entire Action as to Esther Woodward, Carol Nakashima, M.D., Esther Woodward, The Gould Medical Group, Inc. Entered. Each Party to Bear Their Own Costs. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Sutter Gould Medical Foundation; The Gould Medical Group, Inc.; Woodward, Esther; Nakashima, M.D., Carol; Woodward, Esther; Lovell, Autumn. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal per Pltf's Notice of Settlement, set for 12/05/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Woodward, Esther; Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Motion , set for 08/17/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Autumn Lovell, Esther Woodward. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/19/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Payment received by Esther Woodward in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 80764. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Woodward, Esther. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for Esther Woodward . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for Autumn Lovell . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gould Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGHDADI KHALDOUN