This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 07:44:46 (UTC).

Estate of Richard A Bonita

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Estate of Richard A Bonita was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0172

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Decedent

Bonita, Richard A

Not Classified By Court

Bonita, Angelina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Bennett, Michael

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

04/10/2018: Proposed Order

DE174 Allowance Or Rejection of Creditors Claim (Probate-Decedents Estates)

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim DE-174; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE150 Letters

Letters filed and issued. Action Type: Letters Issued; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim in the amount of $4,940.64 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE140 Order for Probate

Order Appointing Personal Representative filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Letters

04/15/2016: Proposed Letters

Proposed Order

04/15/2016: Proposed Order

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

order waiving account and for final distribution

Order Waiving Account, Settling Report and for Final Distribution entered and filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Declaration

Declaration in Response to Calendar Notes filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Satisfaction of claim

Miscellaneous Filing filed by Bonita, Richard A. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Waiver of Account, Report of Personal Representative, petition for its Settlement, for Allowance of Statutory Attorneys' Fees, Exonerating Bond, and for Final Distribution

Petition for Final Distribution filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Bond

Bond filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Bond; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Advice to Heirs

Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE121 Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate Decedents Estates)

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE147 Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative DE-147; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Waiving Account, Settling Report and for Final Distribution entered and filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Hearing re: Final Distribution held on April 18, 2018. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Final Distribution held on 04/18/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Response to Calendar Notes filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Filing filed by Bonita, Richard A. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim DE-174; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Payment received by Michael Bennett in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 269066. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Appointment of Personal Representative , set for 04/18/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative DE-147; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration filed by Bonita, Angelina. Action Type: Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33884. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less